blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2863351
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9710520Global Dossier 18.07.2017B2
US2015112983 23.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
IN3280MU2013 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2863351Global Dossier 22.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
IN3280MU2013 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN3280MUM2013 17.07.2015A
Priority number Date
IN3280MU2013