Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803380

EP2803380 - Medical device control handle with multiplying linear motion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd.
4 Hatnufa Street
20692 Yokneam / IL
[2016/08]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd
4 Hatnufah Street
20692 Yokneam / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Schultz, Jeffrey W.
8372 East Preserve Loop
Chino, CA 91708 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date14180525.912.11.2012
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateUS20111329390910.11.2011         Original published format: US201113293909
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803380
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803380
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/01
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuergriff für medizinische Vorrichtung mit vervielfachender linearer Bewegung[2014/47]
English:Medical device control handle with multiplying linear motion[2014/47]
French:Poignée de commande de dispositif médical avec multiplication de mouvement linéaire[2014/47]
Examination procedure07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
26.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2016Fee for grant paid
31.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12192276.9  / EP2591819
Opposition(s)18.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2012
AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
TR13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU12.11.2012
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
TR13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU12.11.2012
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.11.2012
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IE12.11.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IE12.11.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/35]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0904796  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0041]; figure 8 *
by applicantUSRE34502E
 US13035998
 US14342698
 US20090550307
 US20090550204
 US20080211728
 US19970924611