Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2838054

EP2838054 - Recognition procedure for identifying multiple items in images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.01.2017  [2017/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2015/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Moraleda, Jorge
c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc.
2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / Pavani, Sri Kaushik
c/o Ricoh Innovations Private Limited
Embassy Icon
Ground Floor
No. 3 Infantry Road, Bangalore
560 001 Karnataka / IN
03 / Garg, Anshul
c/o Ricoh Innovations Private Limited
Embassy Icon
Ground Floor
No. 3 Infantry Road, Bangalore
560 001 Karnataka / IN
[N/P]
Former [2015/08]01 / Moraleda, Jorge
c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc.
2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
02 / Pavani, Sri Kaushik
c/o Ricoh Innovations Private Limited
Embassy Icon
Ground Floor
No. 3 Infantry Road, Bangalore
560 001 Karnataka / IN
03 / Garg, Anshul
c/o Ricoh Innovations Private Limited
Embassy Icon
Ground Floor
No. 3 Infantry Road, Bangalore
560 001 Karnataka / IN
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/08]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date14180768.513.08.2014
[2015/08]
Priority number, dateUS20131396729414.08.2013         Original published format: US201313967294
[2015/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2838054
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2838054
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/62, G06K9/46, // G06K9/00
[2015/15]
Former International [2015/08]G06K9/62, G06K9/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erkennungsverfahren zur Identifizierung von mehreren Gegenständen in Bildern[2015/08]
English:Recognition procedure for identifying multiple items in images[2015/08]
French:Procédure de reconnaissance permettant d'identifier des articles multiples dans des images[2015/08]
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/08]
12.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/02]
06.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/02]
Divisional application(s)EP16182169.9  / EP3113080
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
20.10.2015Request for further processing filed
20.10.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.11.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
12.10.2015Request for further processing filed
12.10.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.11.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011011936  (MORANDI SIMONE [IT], et al) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * paragraph [0004]; figure 2; claim 9 *;
 [A]WO2009027839  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,12,13 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2010211602  (MENON KESHAV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2; claim - *
 [XY]  - KHOSLA DEEPAK ET AL, "Method of recognition and pose estimation of multiple occurrences of multiple objects in visual images", AUTOMATIC TARGET RECOGNITION XXI, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110513), vol. 8049, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.883584, pages 1 - 11, XP060013859 [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,12-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.883584