Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818430

EP2818430 - Cassette for dispensing bags from an elongated tubing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Refills Company Limited
Wimberley Rockley New Road
Christ Church BB15126 / BB
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Morand, Michel
5000, rue d'lberville
bureau 311
Montréal, Québec H2H 2S6 / CA
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date14180823.805.10.2007
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818430
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65F1/06, // B65B9/15
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Kassette zur Abgabe von Beuteln aus einem Folienschlauch[2015/01]
English:Cassette for dispensing bags from an elongated tubing[2015/01]
French:Cassette de distribution de sacs à partir d'un tube allongé[2015/01]
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
29.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2019Observations by third parties
18.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07019571.4  / EP2045197
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2003121923  (M. MORAND ET AL.) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * [A] 2,6;
 [XA]WO2007071054  (INTERNATIONAL REFILLS CO. LTD.) [X] 6-9 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4;
 [XA]EP0303517  (L. VAN DER MESCHT) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [A] 6;
 [XA]WO02100723  (SANGENIC INTERNATIONAL LTD.) [X] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 3 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 6
by applicantCA1298191
 CA2383799
 CA2441837