Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2876908

EP2876908 - Method for fine location of a mobile user device receiving an SMS in a telecommunications network using femtocells in open mode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Free Mobile
16 rue de la Ville l'Eveque
75008 Paris / FR
[2015/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Bolin, Paquito
679 rue de Beauregard
34980 Saint Gély du Fesc / FR
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5,rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date14180853.513.08.2014
[2015/22]
Priority number, dateFR2013006144521.11.2013         Original published format: FR 1361445
[2015/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2876908
Date:27.05.2015
Language:FR
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2876908
Date:09.03.2016
Language:FR
[2016/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04W64/00, H04W84/04, H04W4/14, H04W8/08
[2015/31]
Former International [2015/22]H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04W64/00, H04W84/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2015/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Feinlokalisierungsverfahren eines mobilen Benutzergeräts, das eine SMS in einem Funknetz erhält, bei dem Femtozellen im offenen Modus zum Einsatz kommen[2015/22]
English:Method for fine location of a mobile user device receiving an SMS in a telecommunications network using femtocells in open mode[2015/22]
French:Procédé de localisation fine d'un équipement utilisateur mobile destinataire d'un SMS dans un réseau de télécommunications mettant en oeuvre des femtocellules en mode ouvert[2015/22]
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/22]
16.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2015Fee for grant paid
19.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.08.2014
AL09.03.2016
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU13.08.2014
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU13.08.2014
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU13.08.2014
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE13.08.2016
LU13.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2252114  (SFR SA [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * * paragraphs [0009] , [0018] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2011053609  (CHOI-GROGAN YUNG [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0024] *
by applicantEP2252114
 US2011053609