Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2876908 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2876908



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 119
13.01.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.08.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
19.08.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
24.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.06.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
30.04.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
23.02.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
18.09.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 Priority document Search / examination 28
13.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
13.08.2014 Description Search / examination 12
13.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5