Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2876908


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
15.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
13.01.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
05.02.2016 (Expected) grant published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
06.01.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.08.2015 Change - designated states published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
21.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.05.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Request for examination filed published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]