Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2876908
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9294881Global Dossier 22.03.2016B2
US2015141051 21.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
FR1361445 21.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6382697BGlobal Dossier 29.08.2018B2
JP2015104130 04.06.2015A
Priority number Date
FR1361445 21.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2876908Global Dossier 09.03.2016B1
EP2876908 27.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
FR1361445 21.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2576233T 06.07.2016T3
Priority number Date
FR1361445 21.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR3013552 25.12.2015B1
FR3013552 22.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
FR1361445 21.11.2013