Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806091

EP2806091 - An electrical vehicle latch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Closures S.p.A.
Via Francia 101
Frazione Guasticce
57014 Collesalvetti / IT
[2017/40]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Magna Closures SpA
Via Francia 101
Frazione Guasticce
57014 Collesalvetti / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Margheritti, Enrico
c/o MAGNA CLOSURES S.p.A.
Via Francia 101
Frazione Guasticce
57014 Collesalvetti / IT
 [2017/40]
Former [2014/48]01 / Margheritti, Enrico
c/o MAGNA CLOSURES S.p.A.
Via Francia, 101
Frazione Guasticce
57014 Collesalvetti / IT
Representative(s)D'Angelo, Fabio , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date14180972.317.04.2012
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2806091
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2806091
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806091
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:E05B77/16, E05B77/34, E05B81/06, E05B81/14, E05B81/16, E05B81/90
[2017/17]
Former International [2015/51]E05B77/34, E05B81/06, E05B81/14, E05B81/90
Former International [2014/48]E05B81/06, E05B81/14, E05B81/16, E05B77/34, E05B85/02, // E05B81/90
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Fahrzeugverschluss[2014/48]
English:An electrical vehicle latch[2014/48]
French:Serrure de véhicule électrique[2014/48]
Examination procedure10.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/29]
15.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2017Fee for grant paid
25.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12164511.3  / EP2653639
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
LU17.04.2018
[2019/08]
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
PL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
NO04.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2474846  (ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS [FR]) [X] 1,3 * page 7 - page 9; figures 5-8 * [A] 2