Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2985364

EP2985364 - Process for preparing alcohols by electrochemical reductive coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/07]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Aust, Nicola Christiane
Trützschlerstr. 15
68199 Mannheim / DE
02 / Griesbach, Ulrich
Bodelschwinghweg 32
68305 Mannheim / DE
03 / Pelzer, Ralf
Im Schlossgarten 3
37699 Fürstenberg / DE
04 / Haag, Thomas
Fischbacher Str. 32
67691 Hochspeyer / DE
05 / Berens, Ulrich
Im Unterwörth 38a
79589 Binzen / DE
06 / Botzem, Joerg
Maudacher Weg 5
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
[2016/07]
Application number, filing date14181057.214.08.2014
[2016/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2985364
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:C25B3/10
[2016/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkoholen durch elektrochemische reduktive Kopplung[2016/07]
English:Process for preparing alcohols by electrochemical reductive coupling[2016/07]
French:Procédé de préparation d'alcools par couplage réductive électrochimique[2016/07]
Examination procedure21.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
18.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/07]
29.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/07]
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
14.04.2016Request for further processing filed
14.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.04.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JPS57143481  (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,6,9-14 [I] 5;
 [Y]WO2009071478  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3,6 * page 6, lines 1-4; claims 1,4,5 *;
 [YA]  - MAKAROCHKINA S M ET AL, "Cathodic Hydrocodimerization Reactions", JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY USSR, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19740101), vol. 44, ISSN 0022-1279, pages 2523 - 2525, XP009182046 [Y] 12-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-11
 [YA]  - NICOLAS MICHEL ET AL, "Preparation of some tertiary alcohols by electrochemical reduction followed by a coupling reaction of an acetone-olefin mixture", COMPTE RENDUS DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, SERIE C: SCIENCES CHIMIQUES, ELSEVIER FRANCE, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUES ET MEDICALES, FR, (19671106), vol. 265, no. 19, ISSN 0567-6541, pages 1044 - 1047, XP009177897 [Y] 12-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-11
 [Y]  - SCHNATBAUM K ET AL, "Electroorganic Synthesis 66: Selective Anodic Oxidation of Carbohydrates Mediated by TEMPO", SYNTHESIS, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (19990101), vol. 5, doi:10.1055/S-1999-3464, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 864 - 872, XP001189593 [Y] 9-11 * page 864 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1999-3464
by applicantEP0635587
 US4748095
 US4931168
 US5618392
 US6267865
    - M. M. BAIZER, CHEMTECH, (1980), vol. 10, page 161,
    - D. E. DANLY, AICHE SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (1981), vol. 77, page 39,
    - M. F. NIELSEN; J. H. P. UTLEY, Organic Electrochemistry, MARCEL DEKKER, (2001), page 795,
    - S. M. MAKAROCHKINA; A. P. TOMILOV, J. GEN. CHEM. USSR, (1974), vol. 44, page 2523,
    - M. NICOLAS; R. PALLAUD, C. R. ACAD. SC. PARIS, (1967), vol. 265, page 1044,
    - Ionic Liquids in Synthesis, WILEY VCH, (2003),
    - F. BECK; H. GUTHKE, CHEM.-ING.-TECHN., (1969), vol. 41, pages 943 - 950,