Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2842832

EP2842832 - Seal assembly for a steering column opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henniges Automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Am Buchholz 4
31547 Rehburg Loccum / DE
[2015/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Lichtenberg, Wilhelm
Steneltstraße 13
30655 Hannover / DE
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2015/10]
Application number, filing date14181630.620.08.2014
[2015/10]
Priority number, dateDE2013101404622.08.2013         Original published format: DE102013014046
[2015/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2842832
Date:04.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2842832
Date:18.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/16, F16J15/52
[2017/17]
Former International [2015/10]B62D1/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
Former [2015/10]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Baugruppe zur Abdichtung eines Lenksäulendurchbruches[2015/10]
English:Seal assembly for a steering column opening[2015/10]
French:Ensemble comportant joint d'étanchéité d'une perforation pour une colonne de direction[2015/10]
Examination procedure29.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
10.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Fee for grant paid
27.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1538377  (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-6;
 [XA]JP2012017059  (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0050] * * figure - * [A] 4-6;
 [XA]DE102006053265  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0027] * * figure - * [A] 3-8;
 [XA]JP2007022323  (INOUE MTP KK; INOAC ELASTOMER KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0035] * * figure - * [A] 3-8