EP2829963 - Method for presenting menu buttons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoerentrup, Jobst Neustadtstr. 4 30974 Wennigsen / DE | 02 /
Ostermann, Ralf Niddener Weg 7 30657 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Schiller, Harald Apfelgarten 11 30539 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Gandolph, Dirk Wallbrink 2 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Ståhl, Björn Niclas, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | König, Uwe Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 14181827.8 | 22.03.2004 | [2015/05] | Priority number, date | EP20030007665 | 03.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03007665 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2829963 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2829963 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0481, G11B27/34 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0483 (US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2016/04] |
Former [2015/05] | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Darstellung von Menütasten | [2015/05] | English: | Method for presenting menu buttons | [2015/05] | French: | Procédé de présentation de boutons de menu | [2015/05] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 11.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/10] | 17.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04722248.4 / EP1609052 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 18.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees IT, IE, GB, FR, DE | 18.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0135412 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-3 * page 10, line 20 - line 24 * * page 11, line 3 - page 13, line 4 * * figures 3-8 *; | [I]WO0115168 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-3 * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 34 * * figure 10 *; | [I]US5929857 (DINALLO CHRIS A [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * column 7, line 9 - line 19 * * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 52 * * figures 4-7 *; | [I]EP0920017 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0129] * * figures 1-16 *; | [A]US6154209 (NAUGHTON PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 12, line 25 - line 31 *; | [A]JPH11272384 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP1164797 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 10, line 10 - line 20 *; | [A]US2001052127 (SEO KANG SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 7 * | [A] - DVD PLAYER DVD-V7200 Operating Instructions (Basic Operations), PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION, (1998), XP002328097 [A] 1-3 * page 20 - page 21 * |