Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815737

EP2815737 - DMS (Derma Membrane Structure) in foaming creams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
nsc Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Mergenthalerstraße 40
48268 Greven / DE
[2019/26]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Neubourg Skin Care GmbH & Co. KG
Mergenthaler Strasse 40
48268 Greven / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Neubourg, Thomas
Am Alten Kurbad 16
59368 Werne / DE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Jungblut & Seuss
Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10
10589 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date14181865.819.06.2008
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateEP2007011057119.06.2007         Original published format: EP 07110571
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815737
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61K8/37, A61K8/55, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10, A61K9/12, A61K9/127
[2017/16]
Former International [2014/52]A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61K8/36, A61K8/37, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10, A61K9/12, A61K9/127
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBA21.08.2014
MK21.08.2014
RS21.08.2014
TitleGerman:DMS (Derma Membrane Structure) in Schaum-Cremes[2014/52]
English:DMS (Derma Membrane Structure) in foaming creams[2014/52]
French:DMS employée dans des crèmes se présentant sous forme de mousse[2014/52]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.08.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.11.2017Appeal received No.  T0811/18
29.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08761225.5  / EP2167015
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2825629  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * example 1 *;
 [X]WO03017968  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-17 * page 13, line 2 - line 3; table 4 *;
 [X]EP1352639  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * example 2.2 *;
 [X]DE19859427  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-17 * page 10, line 24 - line 29; example 5 *;
 [I]US7001604  (ALBRECHT MARTIN [DE], et al) [I] 1-17 * Spalte 1, Zeilen 34-37, 41-43 und 61-67;; example -; claim 1 *;
 [E]WO2008086953  (BAYER CONSUMER CARE AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-4,6-9,11,13-17 * example - *
by applicant   - Pflegekosmetik, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, pages 151 - 159
    - Fiedler Lexikon der Hilfsstoffe, CANTOR VERLAG AULENDORF, pages 97 - 121