Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2845983 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2845983



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
23.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
20.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
04.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
04.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Description Search / examination 3
04.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
09.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.06.2015 Written request for examination Search / examination 2
29.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
03.10.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
03.10.2014 Priority document Search / examination 20
22.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Description Search / examination 11
22.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 5
22.08.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5