Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2845983


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
30.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2018  [2018/18]
23.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
14.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
11.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2017 Change - German title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
27.01.2017 Change - English title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
27.01.2017 Change - French title published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
05.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.03.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 First examination report
26.06.2015 Change - designated states published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - request for examination published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
11.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
06.02.2015 Request for examination filed published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]