Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2845983

EP2845983 - Roller shutter with a device for joining two slats [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/11]Device for joining two slats of a roller shutter
[2017/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BUBENDORFF
24, rue de Paris
68220 Attenschwiller / FR
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Bubendorf, Robert
48, Rue Wilson
68220 ATTENSCHWILLER / FR
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2017/20]
Former [2015/11]Rhein, Alain
CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN
17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date14181958.122.08.2014
[2015/11]
Priority number, dateFR2013005813423.08.2013         Original published format: FR 1358134
[2015/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2845983
Date:11.03.2015
Language:FR
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2845983
Date:17.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/15
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2015/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rollladenpanzer mit einer Verbindungsvorrichtung von zwei Lamellen[2017/09]
English:Roller shutter with a device for joining two slats[2017/09]
French:Tablier de volet roulant avec un dispositif de jonction de deux lames[2017/09]
Former [2015/11]Verbindungsvorrichtung von zwei Lamellen eines Rollladenpanzers
Former [2015/11]Device for joining two slats of a roller shutter
Former [2015/11]Dispositif de jonction de deux lames de tablier de volet roulant
Examination procedure23.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2017Fee for grant paid
07.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.08.2014
AT17.05.2017
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MK17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU22.08.2014
AT17.05.2017
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU22.08.2014
AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/43]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/39]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IE22.08.2017
LU22.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/18]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1659464  (W BAUMANN FA) [AD] 1-6 * figure 1 * * page 2 *;
 [AD]US4930561  (CLAY ROY T [US]) [AD] 1-6 * figures 1,2,6 * * column 6, line 27 - line 60 *
by applicantDE1659464
 US4930561