Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2842563

EP2842563 - A composition comprising powdered eggshell membrane for use in treating a pre-diabetic mammals. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESM Holdings, LLC
2213 Missouri Avenue
Carthage, MO 64836 / US
[2015/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Ruff, Kevin
2517 Theo Street
Carthage, MO Missouri 64836 / US
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/21]
Former [2015/10]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14182072.012.04.2011
[2015/10]
Priority number, dateUS20100323303P12.04.2010         Original published format: US 323303 P
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2842563
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2842563
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/12, A61K31/7008, A61P3/10
[2015/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
TitleGerman:Eine Zusammensetzung enthaltend pulverisierte Eierschalen Membrane zur Verwendung in der Behandlung einer pre-diabetischen Säugetieren.[2015/46]
English:A composition comprising powdered eggshell membrane for use in treating a pre-diabetic mammals.[2015/10]
French:Une composition comprenant de la membrane de coquille d'oeuf en poudre pour une utilisation dans le traitement de mammifères pré-diabétiques.[2015/51]
Former [2015/10]Eine Zusammensetzung enthaltend pulverisierte Eierschalen Membrane zur Verwendung in der Behandlung einer Pre-diabetischen Säugetieren.
Former [2015/10]Une composition comprenant membranes de la coquille d'oeuf poudre pour une utilisation dans le traitement de mammifères pré-diabétiques.
Examination procedure25.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
20.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2016Fee for grant paid
14.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11769433.1  / EP2557920
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.04.2011
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU12.04.2011
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2018/06]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2016/52]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2016/51]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20060067283  ;
 [T]US2011300240  (RAEDERSTORFF DANIEL [FR] ET AL) [T] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0032] , [0071] , [0078] , [0079] * * claims 1,10,12,16 *;
 [A]US2006099324  (AURIO NICOLAS [CH] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0033] , [0037] , [0061] , [0077] * * claim 48 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 11, Database accession no. 2007-107821, XP002712493 & KR20060067283 A 20060620 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
by applicantUS20070943169