Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2843859

EP2843859 - Method for measuring video-content viewing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/10]Measuring video-content viewing
[2018/50]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2015/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Orlowski, Robert Alan
7090 East Hinsdale Place
Centennial, CO Colorado 80112 / US
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/22]
Former [2015/10]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14182927.529.08.2014
[2015/10]
Priority number, dateUS20131401303129.08.2013         Original published format: US201314013031
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2843859
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2843859
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04H60/31, H04H60/33, H04N21/24, H04N21/442, H04N21/466, H04N21/25, G06Q30/02, // H04H60/32, H04H60/40, H04H60/43, H04H60/45
[2018/50]
Former International [2015/10]H04H60/31, H04H60/33, H04N21/24, H04N21/442, H04N21/466, H04N21/25, G06F11/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2015/10]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Messung von Videoinhaltansichten[2015/10]
English:Method for measuring video-content viewing[2018/50]
French:Procédé de mesure de visualisation de contenu vidéo[2018/50]
Former [2015/10]Measuring video-content viewing
Former [2015/10]Procédé de measure de visualisation de contenu vidéo
Examination procedure04.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
31.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2019Fee for grant paid
17.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007074258  (WOOD CATHERINE A [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0055] * [I] 2-15;
 [XI]US2004215698  (BERTIN CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0106] * [I] 2,3,6-10,13-15;
 [XA]CN102236867  (YOYI BEIJING ADVERTISING CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-15;
 [A]US2012278161  (LAZZARO WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] *
by applicantUS8365212
 US8365213