Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2990892

EP2990892 - Method for connecting an input/output interface of a test device set up to test a control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
dSPACE digital signal processing and control engineering GmbH
Rathenaustraße 26
33102 Paderborn / DE
[2016/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Tegethoff, Marc
Am Richterbusch 19
33106 Paderborn / DE
 [2016/09]
Application number, filing date14183024.001.09.2014
[2016/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2990892
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2990892
Date:22.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G05B17/02, G06F11/22, G06F11/26
[2019/08]
Former International [2016/09]G05B17/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2016/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden einer Eingabe/Ausgabe-Schnittstelle eines für das Testen eines Steuergeräts eingerichteten Testgeräts[2016/09]
English:Method for connecting an input/output interface of a test device set up to test a control device[2016/09]
French:Procédé de liaison d'une interface d'entrée/de sortie d'un appareil d'essai destiné à l'essai d'un appareil de commande[2016/09]
Examination procedure31.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
28.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2019Fee for grant paid
15.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]WO02065220  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 9 - page 10, line 25; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102013100603  (DSPACE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104]; figure 9 *