blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2849292

EP2849292 - Electronic device assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2020
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2020  [2020/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
66 Chung Shan Road
Tu-Cheng District
New Taipei City / TW
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Ching-Chung
Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
66, Chung Shan Road,Tu-Cheng Dist.
New Taipei / TW
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]Towlson, Samantha Jayne, et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date14183253.502.09.2014
[2015/12]
Priority number, dateCN20131039421703.09.2013         Original published format: CN201310394217
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2849292
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2015
ClassificationIPC:H01R27/00
[2015/12]
CPC:
G06F13/385 (EP,US); H01R31/02 (CN); H01R13/703 (CN);
H01R27/00 (EP,US); H01R31/06 (CN); H01R31/065 (CN);
G06F13/423 (EP,US); H01R2201/06 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2015/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtungsanordnung[2015/12]
English:Electronic device assembly[2015/12]
French:Ensemble de dispositif électronique[2015/12]
Examination procedure11.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
06.10.2017Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
06.11.2017Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/44]
24.06.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2020/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2007192519  (CHIH TING HUI [TW], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1a, 2a * [Y] 2-5,10-15;
 [YA]FR2931569  (VIEWSONIC CORP [TW], et al) [Y] 2-5,10-15 * page 4, line 35 - page 7, line 8; figures 3-5 * [A] 1,6-9;
 [A]WO9918580  (KVM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 8,11; claims 1,2,11 *;
 [A]EP1845589  (AOPEN INC [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010165569  (LAI JIN-SHI [CN]) [A] 1,2,5,8,13 * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.