Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819019

EP2819019 - Latency probe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Fawaz, Alain
c/o Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / Boucard, Philippe
c/o Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / Martin, Philippe
c/o Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date14183388.921.06.2012
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS201161500078P22.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161500078 P
US20121352878020.06.2012         Original published format: US201213528780
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819019
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34, G06F13/38
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:Latenzsonde[2015/01]
English:Latency probe[2015/01]
French:Sonde de latence[2015/01]
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
01.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
10.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/52]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12741088.4  / EP2724234
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005177344  (KHALEEL ADNAN [US]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0027] , [0106] - [0118]; figures 13,14 *;
 [A]US5919268  (MCDONALD EDWARD A [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 7 *
 [Y]  - LEANDRO FIORIN ET AL, "A monitoring system for NoCs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NETWORK ON CHIP ARCHITECTURES, NOCARC '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1921249.1921257, ISBN 978-1-45-030397-2, page 25, XP055040710 [Y] 1-17 * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1921249.1921257