Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829899

EP2829899 - Optical connector holder and method for assembling connector holder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]Holder base portion, connector holder, photoelectric converter provided with connector holder, optical connector fixing structure and method for assembling connector holder
[2018/47]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujikura Ltd.
5-1, Kiba 1-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 135-8512 / JP
[2016/35]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Fujikura Ltd.
5-1, Kiba 1-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo
135-8512 / JP
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujiwara, Kunihiko
c/o Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
02 / Nishimura, Akito
c/o Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
03 / Sasaki, Kenji
c/o Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
04 / Hayashi, Yukio
c/o Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
05 / Kurata, Kazuhiko
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 1088001 / JP
06 / Yoshikawa, Takashi
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 1088001 / JP
07 / Sasaki, Junichi
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 1088001 / JP
 [2019/26]
Former [2015/05]01 / Fujiwara, Kunihiko
Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
02 / Nishimura, Akito
Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
03 / Sasaki, Kenji
Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
04 / Hayashi, Yukio
Fujikura Ltd
Sakura Works
1440, Mutsuzaki
Sakura-shi, Chiba 2858550 / JP
05 / Kurata, Kazuhiko
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 1088001 / JP
06 / Yoshikawa, Takashi
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 1088001 / JP
07 / Sasaki, Junichi
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 1088001 / JP
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/27]
Former [2015/05]Hodsdon, Stephen James , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date14183673.419.05.2006
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateJP2005014669819.05.2005         Original published format: JP 2005146698
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2829899
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2829899
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829899
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42, // G02B6/38
[2018/47]
Former International [2015/11]G02B6/42, G02B6/36, // G02B6/38
Former International [2015/05]G02B6/42, G02B6/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/35]
Former [2015/05]DE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Verbinderhalter und Verfahren zur Montage des Verbinderhalters[2018/51]
English:Optical connector holder and method for assembling connector holder[2018/47]
French:Support de connecteur optique et procédé pour assembler le support de connecteur[2018/47]
Former [2015/05]Halterbasisabschnitt, Verbinderhalter, fotoelektrischer Wandler mit Verbinderhalter, Fixierungsstruktur für optischen Verbinder und Verfahren zur Montage des Verbinderhalters
Former [2015/05]Holder base portion, connector holder, photoelectric converter provided with connector holder, optical connector fixing structure and method for assembling connector holder
Former [2015/05]Partie de base d'un support, support de connecteur, convertisseur photoélectrique pourvu d'un tel support, structure de fixation de connecteur optique et procédé pour assembler un support de connecteur
Examination procedure23.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
09.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2019Fee for grant paid
08.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06756392.4  / EP1884810
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
21.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004114866  (HIRAMATSU SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] - [0124]; figures 1-13 * [I] 2-16;
 [A]JP2004246279  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 2-16 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH1184174  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 2-16 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]JPH11119055  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 2-16 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013]; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH1164682  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 2-16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figure 2 *