Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813238

EP2813238 - Use of a neuregulin to treat peripheral nerve injury [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
420 Saw Mill River Road
Ardsley, NY 10502 / US
[2017/18]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
15 Skyline Drive
Hawthorne, NY 10532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caggiano, Anthony, O.
10 Wildwood Rd.
Larchmont, NY New York 10538 / US
02 / Bella, Anthony, J.
13 Spring Cress Dr.
Ottawa, Ontario K2R 1A6 / CA
03 / Iaci, Jennifer, F.
121 Taylortown Rd.
Boonton, NJ New Jersey 07005 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Goodall, Scott , et al
Sagittarius IP
Marlow International
Parkway
Marlow SL7 1YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/18]Goodall, Scott , et al
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2014/51]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date14184157.714.10.2010
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateUS20090251583P14.10.2009         Original published format: US 251583 P
US20090252161P16.10.2009         Original published format: US 252161 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2813238
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2813238
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813238
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/18, A61P25/02
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Neuregulin zur Behandlung von peripheren Nervenläsionen[2014/51]
English:Use of a neuregulin to treat peripheral nerve injury[2014/51]
French:Utilisation d'une neuréguline pour traiter une lésion du nerf périphérique[2014/51]
Examination procedure17.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2017Fee for grant paid
22.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10768844.2  / EP2488194
Divisional application(s)EP17168874.0  / EP3235504
EP19197578.8
Opposition(s)06.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.10.2010
AT03.05.2017
CY03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU14.10.2017
MT14.10.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU14.10.2010
AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU14.10.2017
MT14.10.2017
Former [2018/43]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU14.10.2017
MT14.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU14.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0126607  (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph 4; claims 42-46 * [I] 3-11;
 [XI]WO0189568  (CENES PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 27 * * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 8 * * page 25, line 9 - page 26, line 6 * [I] 3-11;
 [I]US6096873  (SCHAEFER GABRIELE MARIA [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * column 24, line 56 - line 58 *;
 [I]US2002082229  (GODOWSKI PAUL J [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0243] *
 [XI]  - CHEN L-E ET AL, "Recombinant human glial growth factor 2 (rhGGF 2) improves functional recovery of crushed peripheral nerve (a double-blind study)", NEUROCHEMISTRY INTERNATIONAL, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (19981001), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0197-0186(98)00037-0, ISSN 0197-0186, pages 341 - 351, XP002262023 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0197-0186(98)00037-0
 [A]  - DIMACHKIE M M ET AL, "Peripheral nerve injury after brief lithotomy for transurethral collagen injection.", UROLOGY, (20001001), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 1527-9995, pages 669IV - 669VI, XP002619684 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHARMA AJEET D ET AL, "Peripheral nerve injuries during cardiac surgery: Risk factors, diagnosis, prognosis, and prevention", ANESTHESIA AND ANALGESIA, (200012), vol. 91, no. 6, ISSN 0003-2999, pages 1358 - 1369, XP002619685 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BURKE SIÚN ET AL, "When pain after surgery doesn't go away...", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200902), Database accession no. NLM19143655, XP002619686 [A] 1-11 * abstract *
    [ ] - BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS FEB 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19143655, (200902), vol. 37, no. Pt 1, ISSN 1470-8752, pages 318 - 322
 [A]  - COLAK T ET AL, "Comparison of nerve conduction velocities of lower extremities between runners and controls", JOURNAL OF SCIENCE AND MEDICINE IN SPORT, SPORTS MEDICINE AUSTRALIA, BELCONNEN, AU, vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1440-2440(05)80055-6, ISSN 1440-2440, (20051201), pages 403 - 410, (20051201), XP025343663 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1440-2440(05)80055-6
by applicantUS5530109
 US5716930
 US7037888
    - LEE; WOLFE, J AM ACAD ORTHOP SURG, (2008), vol. 8, no. 4, page 243
    - WANG, J SEX MED, (2007), vol. 4, pages 1085 - 97
    - MICHL ET AL., J UROL, (2006), vol. 176, pages 227 - 31
    - BURNETT; LUE, J UROL, (2006), vol. 176, pages 882 - 7
    - FU; GORDON, MOL NEUROBIOL., (1997), vol. 14, pages 67 - 116
    - DAIL, W. G.; TRUJILLO, D.; DC LA ROSA, D.; WALTON, G, "Autonomic innervation of reproductive organs: analysis of the neurons whose axons project in the main penile nerve in the pelvic plexus of the rat", ANAT REC, (1989), vol. 224, page 94
    - LAURIKAINEN A; HILTUNEN JO; VANHATALO S; KLINGE E; SAARMA M, "Glial cell line-derived neurotrophic factor is expressed in penis of adult rat and retrogradely transported in penilc parasympathetic and sensory nerves", CELL TISSUE RES, (2000), vol. 302, pages 321 - 9
    - BELLA AJ; LIN G; FANDEL TM; HICKLING DR; MORASH C; LUE TF, "Nerve growth factor modulation of the cavernous nerve response to injury", J SEX MED, (2009), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 347 - 352
    - KEAST JR, "Plasticity of pelvic autonomic ganglia and urogenital innervation", INT REV CYTOL, (2006), vol. 248, pages 141 - 208
    - ANDERSSON KE; HEDLUND P; ALM P, "Sympathetic pathways and adrencrgic innervation of the penis", INT J IMPOT RES, (2000), vol. 12, pages 5 - 12
    - MULHALL JM; BELLA AJ; BRIGANTI A; MCCULLOUGH A; BROCK G, "Erectile Function Rehabilitation in the Radical Prostatectomy Patient", J SEX MED, (2010), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1687 - 1698
    - MATTHEW R; NANGLE, BSC, PHD; JOSEPH PROIETTO, MBBS, PHD; JANET R. KEAST, BSC, PHD, "Impaired Cavernous Reinnervation after Penile Nerve Injury in Rats with Features of the Metabolic Syndrome", J SEX MED, (2009), vol. 6, pages 3032 - 3044