Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813238 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813238



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 437
09.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
07.12.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
29.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.11.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
17.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.07.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.07.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
29.07.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 34
14.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
14.06.2016 Description Search / examination 5
14.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 8
24.03.2016 Description Search / examination 8
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
12.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
31.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
23.03.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
17.02.2015 European search report Search / examination 7
14.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.01.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 9
05.01.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
04.11.2014 Partial European search report Search / examination 7
10.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Annex Search / examination 6
09.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Description Search / examination 25
09.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
09.09.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
11.05.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80
11.05.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27