Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2995627

EP2995627 - Synthesis of nanoparticular gene carrier systems based on chitosan [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/11]Synthesis of Nanoparticular Gene Carrier Systems Based On Chitosan
[2016/48]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, BG, IT, PT, SM
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Istanbul Universitesi Rektörlügü
Istanbul Universitesi Merkez Kampüsü Beyazit
34452 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Gök, Mehmet Koray
Istanbul Universitesi
Mühendislik Fak
Kimya Müh. Bölümü
Kimyasal, Teknolojiler ABD, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Pabuccuoglu, Saadet
Istanbul Universitesi
Mühendislik Fak
Kimya Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Cevher, Erdal
Istanbul Universitesi
Eczacilik Fak
Farmasötik Teknoloji ABD, Beyazit
34116 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Demir, Kamber
Istanbul Universitesi
Veteriner Fak
Dölerme ve Suni Tohumlama ABD
Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Pabuccuoglu, Serhat
Istanbul Universitesi
Veteriner Fak
Dölerme ve Suni Tohumlama ABD
Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
[2016/48]
Former [2016/11]For all designated states
Istanbul Universitesi Rektorlugu
Istanbul Universitesi
Merkez Kampüsü Beyazit
34452 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Gök, Mehmet Koray
Istanbul Üniversitesi
Mühendislik Fakültesi
Kimya Mühendisligi Bölümü
Kimyasal, Teknolojiler Anabilim Dali, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Pabuccuoglu, Saadet
Istanbul Universitesi
Mühendislik Fak
Kimya Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Cevher, Erdal
Istanbul Üniversitesi
Eczacilik Fakültesi
Farmasötik Teknoloji Anabilim Dali
34116 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Demir, Kamber
Istanbul Üniversitesi
Veteriner Fakültesi
Dölerme Ve Suni Tohumlama Anabilim Dali
Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
For all designated states
Pabuccuoglu, Serhat
Istanbul Üniversitesi
Veteriner Fakültesi
Dölerme Ve Suni Tohumlama Anabilim Dali
Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
Inventor(s)01 / Gök, Mehmet Koray
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
02 / Pabuccuoglu, M Saadet
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
03 / Cevher, Erdal
Istanbul Universitesi, Eczacilik Fak, Farmasötik
Teknolojiler ABD, Beyazit
34116 Istanbul / TR
04 / Demir, Kamber
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
05 / Pabuccuoglu, Serhat
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD, Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
 [2016/48]
Former [2016/34]01 / Gok, Mehmet Koray
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
02 / Pabuccuoglu, M Saadet
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
03 / Cevher, Erdal
Istanbul Universitesi, Eczacilik Fak, Farmasötik
Teknolojiler ABD Beyazit
34116 Istanbul / TR
04 / Demir, Kamber
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
05 / Pabuccuoglu, Serhat
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
Former [2016/11]01 / Gok, Mehmet Koray
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
02 / Pabuccuoglu, Saadet
Istanbul Universitesi, Mühendislik Fak, Kimya
Müh. Bölümü Kimyasal
Teknolojiler ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
03 / Cevher, Erdal
Istanbul Universitesi, Eczacilik Fak, Farmasötik
Teknolojiler ABD Beyazit
34116 Istanbul / TR
04 / Demir, Kamber
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
05 / Pabuccuoglu, Serhat
Istanbul Universitesi, Veteriner Fak, Dölerme ve
Suni Tohumlama ABD Avcilar
34320 Istanbul / TR
Representative(s)Mutlu, Aydin
Invokat Intellectual Property Services
Agaoglu My Office 212-D:241
Basin Ekspres Yolu Tasocagi
Cad. No: 3 Bagcilar
34218 Istanbul / TR
[2016/11]
Application number, filing date14184168.409.09.2014
[2016/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2995627
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2995627
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/08, A61K47/48
[2016/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/17]
Former [2016/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Synthese nanopartikulärer Genträgersysteme auf Basis von Chitosan[2016/11]
English:Synthesis of nanoparticular gene carrier systems based on chitosan[2016/48]
French:Synthèse de systèmes nanoparticulaires transporteurs de gènes à base de chitosane[2016/32]
Former [2016/11]Synthesis of Nanoparticular Gene Carrier Systems Based On Chitosan
Former [2016/11]Synthèse de systèmes de porteuse nanoparticulaire de gènes à base de chitosane
Examination procedure17.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/17]
31.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.11.2016Fee for grant paid
17.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
[2017/41]
Former [2017/36]BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2754823  (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *
 [A]  - KIM J H ET AL, "Synthesis and properties of diethylaminoethyl chitosan", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 34, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(93)90441-C, ISSN 0032-3861, (19930501), pages 1952 - 1957, (19930501), XP024120714 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(93)90441-C
by applicant   - AMIJI, M.M., Polymeric Gene Delivery, CRC PRESS, (2005),
    - KWON, G.S., Polymeric Drug Delivery, TAYLOR & FRANCIS GROUP, (2005),
    - TAIRA, K.; KATAOKA, K.; NIIDOME, T., Non-Viral Gene Therapy, SPRINGER, (2005), pages 4 - 431,2512,
    - WONG, S.Y.; PELET, J.M.; PUTNAM, D., "Polymer Systems For Gene Delivery-Past, Present And Future", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2007.05.007, pages 799 - 837, XP022188823

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2007.05.007
    - LUO, D.; SALTZMAN, W.M., "Synthetic DNA delivery systems", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/71889, pages 33 - 37, XP001061211

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/71889
    - VORHIES, J.S.; NEMUNAITIS, J.J., "Synthetic vs. Natural/Biodegradable Polymers For Delivery of Shrna-Based Cancer Therapies. Methods in Molecular Biology", MACROMOLECULAR DRUG DELIVERY, (2009), vol. 480, pages 11 - 29,
    - THOMAS, M.; KLIBANOV, A.M., "Non-Viral Gene Therapy: Polycation-Mediated DNA Delivery", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 62, pages 27 - 34,
    - MANDKE, R.; SINGH, J., "Cationic nanomicelles for delivery of plasmids encoding interleukin-4 and interleukin-10 for prevention of autoimmune diabetes in mice", PHARM. RES., (2012), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1007/s11095-011-0616-1, pages 883 - 897, XP035016532

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-011-0616-1
    - WU, G.C.; ZHOU, F.; GE, L.F.; LIU, X.M.; KONG, F.S., "Novel Mannan-PEG-PE modified bioadhesive PLGA nanoparticles for targeted gene delivery", J. NANOMATER., (2012), pages 1 - 9,
    - TIERA, M.J.; WINNIK, F.M.; FERNANDES, J.C., "Synthetic and natural polycations for gene therapy: State of the art and new perspectives", CURR. GENE THER., (2006), vol. 6, pages 59 - 71,
    - HOSSEINKHANI, H.; AZZAM, T.; TABATA, Y.; DOMB, A., "Dextran-spermine polycation: an efficient nonviral vector for in vitro and in vivo gene transfection", GENE THER., (2004), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.gt.3302159, pages 194 - 203, XP008111352

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302159
    - CHEVALLAY, B.; HERBAGE, D., "Collagen-based biomaterials as 3D scaffold for cell cultures: Applications for tissue engineering and gene therapy", MED. BIOL. ENG. COMPUTING, (2000), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02344779, pages 211 - 218, XP000914402

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02344779
    - KAUL, G.; AMIJI, M., "Tumor-targeted gene delivery using poly (ethylene glycol)-modified gelatin nanoparticles: in vitro and in vivo studies", PHARM. RES., (2005), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1007/s11095-005-4590-3, pages 951 - 961, XP019370872

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-005-4590-3
    - KOMMAREDDY, S.; AMIJI, M., "Antiangiogenic gene therapy with systemically administered sFlt-1 plasmid DNA in engineered gelatin-based nanovectors", CANCER GENE THER., (2007), vol. 14, pages 488 - 498,
    - ELKINS, R.; HENNEN, W.J., BSME, W.C.S. Scaleless Dieting: The Essential Survival Kit for the Overweight, Obese and Diabetics, WOODLAND PUBLISHING, (1996),
    - AMIJI, M.M., POLYMERIC GENE DELIVERY, CRC PRESS, (2005),
    - CHO, Y.-W.; HAN, S.-S.; KO, S.-W., "PVA CONTAINING CHITO-OLIGOSACCHARIDE SIDE CHAIN", POLYMER, (2000), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1016/S0032-3861(99)00351-1, pages 2033 - 2039, XP004244197

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(99)00351-1
    - SARANYA, N.; MOORTHI, A.; SARAVANAN, S.; DEVI, M.P.; SELVAMURUGAN, N., "Chitosan and its derivatives for gene delivery", INT. J. BIOL. MACROMOL., (2011), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2010.11.013, pages 234 - 238, XP028360046

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2010.11.013
    - PARK, S.; JEONG, E.J.; LEE, J.; RHIM, T.; LEE, S.K.; LEE, K.Y., "Preparation and characterization of nonaarginine-modified chitosan nanoparticles for siRNA delivery", CARBOHYD. POLYM., (2013), vol. 92, pages 57 - 62,
    - JEEVITHA, D.; AMARNATH, K., "Chitosan/PLA nanoparticles as a novel carrier for the delivery of anthraquinone: Synthesis, characterization and in vitro cytotoxicity evaluation", COLLOID SURF B, (2013), vol. 101, pages 126 - 134,
    - OPANASOPIT, P.; SAJOMSANG, W.; RUKTANONCHAI, U.; MAYEN, V.; ROJANARATA, T.; NGAWHIRUNPAT, T., "Methylated N-(4-pyridinylmethyl) chitosan as a novel effective safe gene carrier", INT.J. PHARM., (2008), vol. 364, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2008.08.003, pages 127 - 134, XP025562427

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2008.08.003
    - SAJOMSANG, W.; GONIL, P.; RUKTANONCHAI, U.R.; PETCHSANGSAI, M.; OPANASOPIT, P.; PUTTIPIPATKHACHORN, S., "Effects of molecular weight and pyridinium moiety on water-soluble chitosan derivatives for mediated gene delivery", CARBOHYD. POLYM., (2013), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1016/j.carbpol.2012.08.053, pages 508 - 517, XP028956670

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2012.08.053
    - ALVES, N.; MANO, J., "Chitosan derivatives obtained by chemical modifications for biomedical and environmental applications", INT. J. BIOL. MACROMOL., (2008), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2008.09.007, pages 401 - 414, XP055278922

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2008.09.007
    - ZOHURIAAN-MEHR, M.J., "Advances in chitin and chitosan modification through graft copolymerization: A comprehensive review", IRAN POLYM. J., (2005), vol. 14, pages 235 - 265,
    - KIM, T.H.; JIANG, H.L.; JERE, D.; PARK, I.K.; CHO, M.H.; NAH, J.W.; CHOI, Y.J.; AKAIKE T.; CHO, C.S., "Chemical Modification of Chitosan as a Gene Carrier In Vitro and In Vivo", PROG. POLYM. SCI., (2007), vol. 32, pages 726 - 753, XP022133246