blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2848887
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9354438Global Dossier 31.05.2016B2
US2015146289 28.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
AT505672013 11.09.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2848887Global Dossier 28.06.2017B1
EP2848887 27.05.2015A3
EP2848887 18.03.2015A2
Priority number Date
AT505672013 11.09.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT514600B 15.02.2015B1
AT514600 15.02.2015A4
Priority number Date
AT505672013 11.09.2013