blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2848887

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BELapse: 30.09.2017
 BGLapse: 28.09.2017
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 28.06.2017
 EELapse: 28.06.2017
 ESLapse: 28.06.2017
 FILapse: 28.06.2017
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 29.09.2017
 HRLapse: 28.06.2017
 HULapse: 10.09.2014
 IELapse: 10.09.2017
 ISLapse: 28.10.2017
 ITLapse: 28.06.2017
 LI 
 LTLapse: 28.06.2017
 LULapse: 10.09.2017
LVLapse: 28.06.2017
 MCLapse: 28.06.2017
 MK 
 MTLapse: 28.06.2017
 NLLapse: 28.06.2017
 NOLapse: 28.09.2017
 PLLapse: 28.06.2017
 PT 
 ROLapse: 28.06.2017
 RSLapse: 28.06.2017
 SELapse: 28.06.2017
 SILapse: 28.06.2017
 SKLapse: 28.06.2017
 SMLapse: 28.06.2017
 TR 
Examination procedure15.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted28.06.2017
Opposition procedure29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit published on 06.06.2018 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.03.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:18.03.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140910
 
Event date:18.03.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F41G 1/38 20060101AFI20150420BHEP
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:06.01.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20151126
 
Event date:06.01.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F41G 1/38 20060101AFI20161123BHEP
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G02B 23/16 20060101ALN20161123BHEP
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20161207
 
Event date:10.05.2017 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:SWAROVSKI-OPTIK KG.
 
Event date:17.05.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F41G 1/38 20060101AFI20170412BHEP
 
Event date:17.05.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:17.05.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G02B 23/16 20060101ALN20170412BHEP
 
Event date:24.05.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170428
 
Event date:28.06.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:28.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 905268 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20170715
 
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:10.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 502014004394 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:14.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:4
 
Event date:15.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:ABP PATENT NETWORK AG, CH
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170929
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170928
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:10.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170928
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171028
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:29.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 502014004394 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:06.06.2018 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20180329
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:28.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:29.06.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170910
 
Event date:03.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:5
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170910
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170930
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170628
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180703
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180706
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180702
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180806
Year of Fee Payment:05
 
Event date:12.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502014004394 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:ABP BURGER RECHTSANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20140910
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20190522
Year of Fee Payment:06