Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848887

EP2848887 - Adjustment knob with indication of the number of revolutions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/12]Adjustment turret with indication of the number of revolutions
[2016/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swarovski-Optik KG.
Daniel-Swarovski-Strasse 70
6067 Absam / AT
[2017/19]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG
Daniel-Swarovski-Strasse 70
6067 Absam / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Ingenito, Mario
Hochgallzein 23
6222 Gallzein / AT
02 / Wechselberger, Sandra
Archenwald 8
6116 Weer / AT
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Burger, Hannes
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date14184188.210.09.2014
[2015/12]
Priority number, dateAT2013005056711.09.2013         Original published format: AT 505672013
[2015/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2848887
Date:18.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2848887
Date:27.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2848887
Date:28.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:F41G1/38, // G02B23/16
[2016/52]
Former International [2015/12]F41G1/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2015/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verstellturm mit Anzeige der Anzahl der Umdrehungen[2015/12]
English:Adjustment knob with indication of the number of revolutions[2016/52]
French:Bouton de réglage avec indication du nombre de révolutions[2016/52]
Former [2015/12]Adjustment turret with indication of the number of revolutions
Former [2015/12]Tour de réglage avec indication du nombre de révolutions
Examination procedure26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
07.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2017Fee for grant paid
15.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.09.2014
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/39]DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/34]DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
IE10.09.2017
LU10.09.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/29]DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2007108896  (JOHAN LOF INC [US]; LOF JOHAN [SE] LOF JOHAN [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,14,17,18,21,22,25 * page 4, line 8 - page 10, line 17 * * figures 1-5, 7 * [A] 7,24 [I] 4,8,10-13,15,16,19,20;
 [A]WO2012119574  (STEINER OPTIK GMBH [DE]; JAESCHKE OLIVER [DE]; LOTTES GERD [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 2, lines 11-17 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 7 * * page 7, lines 18-23 * * figures 10-13 *;
 [A]US6691447  (OTTEMAN RODNEY H [US]) [A] 1,3,5-7,22 * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 32 * * figures 1, 6, 7 *;
 [A]WO2013102869  (ASELSAN ELEKTRONIK SANAYI VE TICARET ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]; TEKIN BILGEH) [A] 18-21,24,25 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, lines 7-9 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010229451  (HAMILTON SAMUEL J [US]) [A] 22 * paragraph [0027] * * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE102006016834  (SCHMIDT & BENDER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * paragraphs [0061] , [0 75] , [0 76] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE202008008630U  (KAHLES GES M B H [AT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 81] * * figure 6 *
by applicantDE20301749U
 DE102011013456
 US6691447
 WO2012119574