Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816607

EP2816607 - Field effect transistor using amorphous oxide film as channel layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]Field effect transistor using amorphous oxide film as channel layer and corresponding manufacturing method
[2017/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2017/46]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwasaki, Tatsuya
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2017/46]
Former [2014/52]01 / Iwasaki, Tatsuya
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date14184889.505.09.2006
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateJP2005025826306.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005258263
JP2006022155215.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006221552
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816607
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816607
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/786, H01L29/66
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Feldeffektransistor mit einem amorphen Oxidfilm als Kanalschicht[2017/26]
English:Field effect transistor using amorphous oxide film as channel layer[2017/22]
French:Transistor à effet de champ comprenant un film d'oxyde amorphe en tant que couche de canal[2017/22]
Former [2014/52]Feldeffektransistor mit einem amorphen Oxidfilm als Kanalschicht und entsprechendes Herstelllungsverfahren
Former [2014/52]Field effect transistor using amorphous oxide film as channel layer and corresponding manufacturing method
Former [2014/52]Transistor à effet de champ comprenant un film d'oxyde amorphe en tant que couche de canal et méthode de fabrication correspondante
Examination procedure02.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
07.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2017Fee for grant paid
27.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06797762.9  / EP1915784
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
16.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/41]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004114391  (SHARP KK [JP]; SUGIHARA TOSHINORI; OHNO HIDEO; KAWASAKI MASASHI) [I] 1-4 * abstract *;
 US2006244107  [ ] (SUGIHARA TOSHINORI [JP] ET AL);
 [A]JP2002076356  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0008] *
by applicantWO2007029844
    - K. NOMURA ET AL., NATURE, (200411), vol. 432, pages 488 - 492