Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2816607 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2816607



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 305
19.09.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.10.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
27.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 55
01.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 55
14.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.10.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
02.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
02.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
11.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
16.09.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
16.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Description Search / examination 52
16.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
16.09.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
04.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
04.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33