Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2998249

EP2998249 - Conveyor device for conveying objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dematic Logistics GmbH
Schelpmilser Weg 20
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2016/12]For all designated states
SDI Group Germany Material Handling Solutions GmbH
Schelpmilserweg 14 b
33609 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Otto, Thomas
Sennehof 13a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/25]
Former [2016/12]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14185396.018.09.2014
[2016/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2998249
Date:23.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2998249
Date:20.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/84
[2016/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
Former [2016/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fördervorrichtung zur Beförderung von Gegenständen[2016/12]
English:Conveyor device for conveying objects[2016/12]
French:Dispositif de convoyage pour le convoyage d'objets[2016/12]
Examination procedure08.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/42]
15.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2018Fee for grant paid
08.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.06.2018
CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
MT20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
IE18.09.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL20.06.2018
CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
IE18.09.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/40]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
IE18.09.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/37]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
IE18.09.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/33]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
IE18.09.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/30]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
LU18.09.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/26]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/24]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2018/52]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
NO20.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]ES2381832  (MOSTOLES IND [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1-19 *;
 [Y]WO0002802  (CRISPLANT AS [DK]; ANDERSEN PER [DK]; KIBSGAARD STEEN [DK]; STENSGAARD) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2005077144  (BERKERS ANTONIUS JOHANNES HEND [NL] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0032502  (CRISPLANT AS [DK]; BARKLIN PER [DK]; ANDERSEN HENRIK [DK]; KOFOED RALP) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19959843  (SIGMA INNOVATIONSGMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19959843
 EP2159174