Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2926915

EP2926915 - Screen with disk rollers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Promeco Energy & Plants SRL
Via Tevere, 51
22073 Fino Mornasco, CO / IT
[2015/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Rebai, Paolo
Via Mugiasca, 4
22100 COMO / IT
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/35]
Former [2015/41]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14185519.719.09.2014
[2015/41]
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0051827.03.2014         Original published format: IT MI20140518
[2015/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2926915
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2926915
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B07B1/15
[2017/14]
Former International [2015/41]B07B1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2015/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sieb mit Siebscheiben[2017/14]
English:Screen with disk rollers[2015/41]
French:Crible à rouleaux à disques[2017/14]
Former [2015/41]Schirm mit Plattenrollen
Former [2015/41]Écran à rouleaux de disque
Examination procedure03.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/19]
21.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2017Fee for grant paid
17.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.09.2014
AT30.08.2017
CY30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MK30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
MT19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR30.10.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU19.09.2014
AT30.08.2017
CY30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
MT19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR30.10.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU19.09.2014
AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
MT19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR30.10.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/49]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
MT19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR30.10.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
MT19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/36]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/34]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE19.09.2017
LU19.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/30]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
LU19.09.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/26]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1106264  (ECOSTAR SRL [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034]; figures 1a, 4a,4b,5a,5b,5c; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2011045656  (ECOSTAR SRL [IT]; CAPPOZZO DOMENICO [IT]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 26 - line 30 * * page 3, line 7 - line 10 * * page 3, line 15 - line 21 * * page 3, line 26 - line 29 * * page 5, line 20 - line 25 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 31 - line 35; figures 1,2,6-10; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE102007027846  (NEUENHAUSER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024]; figures 4-5; claim 1 *