Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2853154

EP2853154 - Device for the uniform distribution of fodder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Studio Progettazione Industriale di Pecis Ing. Luigi S.A.S.
Via Tasso, 109
24121 Bergamo / IT
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Madaschi, Matteo Giacomo
Via Provinciale, 24
24060 Bianzano BG / IT
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2020/03]
Former [2015/14]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14186732.529.09.2014
[2015/14]
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0160530.09.2013         Original published format: IT MI20131605
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2853154
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2853154
Date:15.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01K5/00
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Former [2015/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur gleichmäßigen Verteilung von Futter[2015/14]
English:Device for the uniform distribution of fodder[2015/14]
French:Dispositif pour la distribution uniforme de fourrage[2015/14]
Examination procedure04.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
30.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2019Fee for grant paid
05.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201603   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0298548  (LIETS BV [NL]) [X] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 1 - line 25 * * column 4, line 29 - column 7, line 14 * * column 11, line 37 - column 13, line 49 * * figures 3-9; claims 14-31 * [Y] 2-7;
 [Y]US2012014208  (MARGGI JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005077404  (KISENWETHER DAVID [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,4,5 *