blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3001717 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3001717



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
11.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.07.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
16.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.10.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
06.09.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.08.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
21.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.08.2016 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 2
05.08.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
04.04.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
23.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
10.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
29.09.2014 Description Search / examination 19
29.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
29.09.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5