Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3001717

EP3001717 - Interference detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Keysight Technologies Singapore (Sales) Pte.Ltd.
1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
[2018/48]
Former [2016/43]For all designated states
Keysight Technologies Singapore (Holdings) Pte. Ltd.
8 Wilkie Road, 03-01
Wilkie Edge
Singapore 228095 / SG
Former [2016/13]For all designated states
Anite Finland Oy
Yrttipellontie 10
90230 Oulu / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Laukkanen, Juha
Anite Finland Oy
Yrttipellontie 10
90230 Oulu / FI
 [2016/13]
Representative(s)Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2016/13]Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date14186809.129.09.2014
[2016/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3001717
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/00, H04W16/14
[2016/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2016/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Störungsdetektion[2016/13]
English:Interference detection[2016/13]
French:Détection d'interférence[2016/13]
Examination procedure21.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
11.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011090939  (DIENER NEIL R [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1, 4, 5, 7, 8 *;
 [X]WO2014152816  (MARVELL WORLD TRADE LTD [BB], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0094] * * claims 1, 5-7 *;
 [I]GB2422968  (CAMBRIDGE SILICON RADIO LTD [GB]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 17 - page 10, line 5 *;
 [I]WO2006051509  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6771968  (HEUBEL MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 63 *;
 [A]WO2013123638  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 11 *