blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2884768

EP2884768 - Measuring apparatus, measuring system and measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6 Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Inagaki, Tomohiro
c/o Kyocera Corporation Head Office
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto, 612-8501 / JP
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/33]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Former [2015/25]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date14186822.417.05.2013
[2015/25]
Priority number, dateJP2012011489418.05.2012         Original published format: JP 2012114894
JP2012015814013.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012158140
JP2012015814113.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012158141
JP2012016886830.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012168868
JP2012016885930.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012168859
JP2012020268414.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012202684
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2884768
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2884768
Date:24.06.2015
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2884768
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/24, G01H1/04, H04R29/00, H04R25/00
[2016/14]
CPC:
H04M1/24 (EP,US); H04R29/001 (US); G01H1/04 (US);
H04R25/30 (EP,US); H04R25/70 (EP,US); H04R29/00 (EP,US);
H04R5/027 (US); G01H1/12 (US); G01H17/00 (US);
G01M7/02 (US); G01M7/06 (US); H04R2460/13 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/26]H04R25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
TitleGerman:Messvorrichtung, Messsystem und Messverfahren[2015/25]
English:Measuring apparatus, measuring system and measuring method[2015/25]
French:Appareil de mesure, système de mesure et procédé de mesure[2015/25]
Examination procedure29.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/25]
22.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2016Fee for grant paid
23.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13791528.6  / EP2852132
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.05.2013
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
IS17.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2020/15]HU17.05.2013
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2019/52]HU17.05.2013
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2019/48]HU17.05.2013
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU17.05.2013
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2018/46]AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
IE17.05.2017
LU17.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
LU17.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2003309899  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [A] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2456846  (WOLFSON MICROELECTRONICS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *
by applicantJP2005348193
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.