Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2837386

EP2837386 - Detoxified Escherichia coli immunogens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2017/24]
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Serino, Laura
Novartis Vaccines
Via Fiorentina 1
53100 Siena / IT
02 / Fontana, Maria Rita
Novartis Vaccines
Via Fiorentina 1
53100 Siena / IT
03 / Moriel, Danilo Gomes
Novartis Vaccines
Via Fiorentina 1
53100 Siena / IT
 [2015/08]
Representative(s)Sanderson, Andrew John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents, CN9.25.1
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2018/10]
Former [2015/08]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date14187138.416.07.2010
[2015/08]
Priority number, dateUS20090226219P16.07.2009         Original published format: US 226219 P
US20090290654P29.12.2009         Original published format: US 290654 P
[2015/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2837386
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2837386
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/02
[2017/04]
Former International [2015/08]A61K39/108
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2015/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Detoxifizierte Escherichia coli-Immunogene[2015/08]
English:Detoxified Escherichia coli immunogens[2015/08]
French:Immunogènes d'Escherichia coli détoxifiés[2017/04]
Former [2015/08]Immunogènes d'escherichia coli détoxifiés
Examination procedure18.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
19.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2017
13.01.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2017Fee for grant paid
20.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10752175.9  / EP2464658
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Request for further processing for:26.01.2018Request for further processing filed
26.01.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.02.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU16.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2019/17]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU16.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
SM07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL07.03.2018
AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2006089264  (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 20, paragraph l * * page 61, paragraph l - page 65, paragraph 3 * * page 136; compound orf03526 *;
 [XPL]WO2009104092  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 2, line 13 - line 31 * * page 8, line 30 - page 13, line 11 * * page 13, line 32 - line 34 * * page 16, line 22 - line 25 * * page 41 - page 42 * * page 44, line 8 - line 31 * [L] 1-15;
 [IP]  - MORIEL DANILO GOMES ET AL, "Identification of protective and broadly conserved vaccine antigens from the genome of extraintestinal pathogenic Escherichia coli", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 107, no. 20, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0915077107, ISSN 0027-8424, (20100518), pages 9072 - 9077, (20100503), XP002612615 [IP] 1-15 * page 9073, column r, paragraph 3; tables 1, 2 * * page 9074, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 9075, column r, paragraph l - page 9076, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0915077107
by applicantWO2006089264
 WO2006091517
 US5707829
 US6355271
 WO9014837
 US2007014805
 WO9511700
 US6080725
 WO2005097181
 WO2006113373
 US6630161
 US5057540
 WO9633739
 EP0109942
 WO9611711
 WO0007621
 WO03024480
 WO03024481
 EP0689454
 WO0226757
 WO9962923
 WO9840100
 US6207646
 US6239116
 US6429199
 WO0195935
 WO03035836
 WO0122972
 WO9517211
 WO9842375
 WO9940936
 WO9944636
 WO9927960
 US6090406
 US5916588
 EP0626169
 WO9952549
 WO0121207
 WO0121152
 US4680338
 US4988815
 WO9215582
 US4689338
 US4929624
 US5238944
 US5266575
 US5268376
 US5346905
 US5352784
 US5389640
 US5395937
 US5482936
 US5494916
 US5525612
 US6083505
 US6440992
 US6627640
 US6656938
 US6660735
 US6660747
 US6664260
 US6664264
 US6664265
 US6667312
 US6670372
 US6677347
 US6677348
 US6677349
 US6683088
 US6703402
 US6743920
 US6800624
 US6809203
 US6888000
 US6924293
 WO03011223
 WO2004060308
 WO2004064759
 US6924271
 US2005070556
 US5658731
 US5011828
 WO2004087153
 US6605617
 WO0218383
 WO2004018455
 WO03082272
 US2005215517
 FR2859633
 WO2004064715
 US5936076
 US2005192248
 WO2005102049
 WO03105769
 WO9911241
 WO9400153
 WO9857659
 EP0835318
 EP0735898
 EP0761231
 WO02081653
 WO9007936
 WO9403622
 WO9325698
 WO9325234
 US5219740
 WO9311230
 WO9310218
 US4777127
 GB2200651
 EP0345242
 WO9102805
 WO9412649
 WO9303769
 WO9319191
 WO9428938
 WO9511984
 WO9500655
 US5814482
 WO9507994
 WO9617072
 WO9530763
 WO9742338
 WO9011092
 US5580859
 US5422120
 WO9513796
 WO9423697
 WO9114445
 EP0524968
 US5206152
 WO9211033
 US5149655
    - MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (199809), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 597 - 635
    - KAPER ET AL., NAT REV MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 123 - 40
    - ANJUM ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2007), vol. 73, pages 5692 - 7
    - RUSSO; JOHNSON, JLNFECT DIS, (2000), vol. 181, pages 1753 - 1754
    - SMITH ET AL., FOODBORNE PATHOGENS AND DISEASE, (2007), vol. 4, pages 134 - 63
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - RICE ET AL., TRENDS GENET, (2000), vol. 16, pages 276 - 277
    - GEYSEN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 3998 - 4002
    - CARTE, METHODS MOL BIOL, (1994), vol. 36, pages 207 - 23
    - JAMESON, BA ET AL., CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 181 - 186
    - RADDRIZZANI; HAMMER, BRIEF BIOINFORM, (2000), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 179 - 89
    - BUBLIL ET AL., PROTEINS, (2007), vol. 68, no. 1, pages 294 - 304
    - DE LALLA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 1725 - 29
    - KWOK ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 22, pages 583 - 88
    - BRUSIC ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (1998), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 121 - 30
    - MEISTER ET AL., VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 581 - 91
    - ROBERTS ET AL., AIDS RES HUM RETROVIRUSES, (1996), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 593 - 610
    - MAKSYUTOV; ZAGREBELNAYA, COMPUT APPL BIOSCI, (1993), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 291 - 7
    - FELLER; DE LA CRUZ, NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, no. 6311, pages 720 - 1
    - HOPP, PEPTIDE RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 6, pages 183 - 190
    - WELLING ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1985), vol. 188, pages 215 - 218
    - DAVENPORT ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1995), vol. 42, pages 392 - 297
    - TSURUI; TAKAHASHI, JPHARMACOL SCI., (2007), vol. 105, no. 4, pages 299 - 316
    - TONG ET AL., BRIEF BIOINFORM., (2007), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 96 - 108
    - SCHIRLE ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2001), vol. 257, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 16
    - CHEN ET AL., AMINO ACIDS, (2007), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 423 - 8
    - "Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols", Methods in Molecular Medicine series, vol. 42
    - PODDA; DEL GIUDICE, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 197 - 203
    - PODDA, VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680
    - ALLISON; BYARS, RES IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 143, pages 519 - 25
    - HARIHARAN ET AL., CANCER RES, (1995), vol. 55, pages 3486 - 9
    - SULI ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, no. 25-26, pages 3464 - 9
    - BARR ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 32, pages 247 - 271
    - SJOLANDERET ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 32, pages 321 - 338
    - NIIKURA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2002), vol. 293, pages 273 - 280
    - LENZ ET AL., IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 5346 - 5355
    - PINTO ET AL., JLNFECT DIS, (2003), vol. 188, pages 327 - 338
    - GERBER ET AL., J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, pages 4752 - 4760
    - GLUCK ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages B10 - B16
    - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278
    - EVANS ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 219 - 229
    - MERALDI ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 2485 - 2491
    - PAJAK ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 836 - 842
    - KANDIMALLA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, pages 2393 - 2400
    - KRIEG, NATURE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 9, pages 831 - 835
    - MCCLUSKIE ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 179 - 185
    - KANDIMALLA ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 654 - 658
    - BLACKWELL ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 170, pages 4061 - 4068
    - KRIEG, TRENDS IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 23, pages 64 - 65
    - KANDIMALLA ET AL., BBRC, (2003), vol. 306, pages 948 - 953
    - BHAGAT ET AL., BBRC, (2003), vol. 300, pages 853 - 861
    - SCHELLACK ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, pages 5461 - 72
    - BEIGNON ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2002), vol. 70, pages 3012 - 3019
    - PIZZA ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2534 - 2541
    - PIZZA ET AL., INT JMED MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 290, pages 455 - 461
    - SCHARTON-KERSTEN ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2000), vol. 68, pages 5306 - 5313
    - RYAN ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1999), vol. 67, pages 6270 - 6280
    - PARTIDOS ET AL., IMMUNOL LETT, (1999), vol. 67, pages 209 - 216
    - PEPPOLONI ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 285 - 293
    - PINE ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2002), vol. 85, pages 263 - 270
    - TEBBEY ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 2723 - 34
    - DOMENIGHINI ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 15, pages 1165 - 1167
    - SINGH ET AL., J CONT RELEASE, (2001), vol. 70, pages 267 - 276
    - ANDRIANOV ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 109 - 115
    - PAYNE ET AL., ADV DRUG DELIVERY REVIEW, (1998), vol. 31, pages 185 - 196
    - STANLEY, CLIN EXP DERMATOL, (2002), vol. 27, pages 571 - 577
    - WU ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RES., (2004), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 79 - 83
    - VASILAKOS ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 204, no. 1, pages 64 - 74
    - JONES, CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2003), vol. 4, pages 214 - 218
    - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORGMED CHEM LETT, (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278
    - WONG ET AL., J CLIN PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 735 - 42
    - DYAKONOVA ET AL., INT IMMUNOPHARMACOL, (2004), vol. 4, no. 13, pages 1615 - 23
    - SIGNORELLI; HADDEN, INT IMMUNOPHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 3, no. 8, pages 1177 - 86
    - DE LIBERO ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 5, pages 485 - 496
    - OKI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVESTIG., vol. 113, pages 1631 - 1640
    - YANG ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2004), vol. 43, pages 3818 - 3822
    - GOFF ET AL., J. AM. CHEM., SOC., (2004), vol. 126, pages 13602 - 13603
    - COOPER, PHARM BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 6, pages 559 - 80
    - DURANT ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2007), vol. 75, pages 1916 - 25
    - DONNELLY ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 617 - 648
    - STRUGNELL ET AL., IMMUNOL CELL BIOL, (1997), vol. 75, no. 4, pages 364 - 369
    - CUI, ADV GENET, (2005), vol. 54, pages 257 - 89
    - ROBINSON; TORRES, SEMINARS IN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 271 - 283
    - BRUNHAM ET AL., J INFECT DIS 181 SUPPL, (2000), vol. 3, pages 538 - 43
    - SVANHOLM ET AL., SCAND J IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 345 - 53
    - FINDEIS ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 202
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, page 621
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 542
    - ZENKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1990), vol. 87, page 3655
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 338
    - JOLLY, CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, page 51
    - KIMURA, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, page 845
    - CONNELLY, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 1, page 185
    - KAPLITT, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, page 148
    - CURIEL, HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, page 147
    - WU, J BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 16985
    - PHILIP, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, page 2411
    - WOFFENDIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, page 11581
    - Methods In Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.
    - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1986), vol. I-IV
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489