EP3002938 - Customer interaction centre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Voxtron Factory N.V. Hoogkamerstraat 30A 9140 Temse / BE | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Houts, Wim Lindenlaan 63c 9120 Beveren / BE | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | [2016/14] | Application number, filing date | 14187313.3 | 01.10.2014 | [2016/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002938 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
H04M3/5141 (EP);
H04M2201/54 (EP);
H04M2203/355 (EP);
H04M2203/408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kundeninteraktionszentrum | [2016/14] | English: | Customer interaction centre | [2016/14] | French: | Centre d'interaction des clients | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Anonymous, "Cisco Unified Contact Center Express Design Guide, Release 10.5(1)", (20140611), page i, 2, Cisco Systems, Inc., URL: http://www.cisco.com/c/en/us/td/docs/voice_ip_comm/cust_contact/contact_center/crs/express_10_5/design/guide/UCCX_BK_C2EB4F58_00_unified-cccx-design-guide-10-5.pdf, (20141117), XP002732577 [X] 1-12 * page 2; figure 1 * | [X] - Anonymous, "Cisco Unified Contact Center Express Getting Started with Scripts,Release 10.0(1)", (20131220), Cisco Systems, inc., URL: http://www.cisco.com/c/dam/en/us/td/docs/voice_ip_comm/cust_contact/contact_center/crs/express_10_0/programming/guide/SeriesVol1.pdf, (20141117), XP002733271 [X] 1-12 * page Frontpg. * * pages 2-32 - pages 2-36 * * pages 6-1 - pages 7-14 * | [X] - Anonymous, "Cisco Unified Contact Center Express Editor Step Reference Guide,Release 10.0(1)", (20140606), Cisco Systems, inc., URL: http://www.cisco.com/c/dam/en/us/td/docs/voice_ip_comm/cust_contact/contact_center/crs/express_10_0/programming/guide/SeriesVol2.pdf, (20141117), XP002733272 [X] 1-12 * page Frontpg. * * pages 2-46 - pages 2-47 * * pages 2-69 * * pages 2-88 * * pages 2-119 * * pages 2-199 * | [X] - Anonymous, "Cisco Unified CCX Administration Guide, Release 10.5", (20140725), Cisco Systems, Inc., URL: http://www.cisco.com/c/en/us/td/docs/voice_ip_comm/cust_contact/contact_center/crs/express_10_5/config/guides/UCCX_BK_U9F91527_00_unified-ccx-administration-guide-release-10-5.pdf, (20141117), XP002733273 [X] 1-12 * Pages i, 2, 13, 54 * | [ ] - Anymous, "Cisco Unified Contact Center Express 10.5- Data Sheet", (20140521), pages 1 - 5, Cisco Systems, Inc., URL: http://www.cisco.com/c/en/us/products/collateral/customer-collaboration/unified-contact-center-express/datasheet-c78-731688.pdf, (20141117), XP002732578 [ ] * page 3 * | by applicant | US5825869 | WO2005093618 | WO2004038596 |