Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2857866

EP2857866 - X-ray sensor and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rayence Co., Ltd.
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Heo, Sung Kyn
14, Samsung 1 ro 1 gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
02 / Lee, Ho Seok
14, Samsung 1 ro 1 gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/15]
Application number, filing date14187398.402.10.2014
[2015/15]
Priority number, dateKR2013011800402.10.2013         Original published format: KR 20130118004
KR2013011800502.10.2013         Original published format: KR 20130118005
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2857866
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2857866
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/20
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Former [2015/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Röntgensensor und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon[2015/15]
English:X-ray sensor and method of manufacturing the same[2015/15]
French:Capteur à rayon X et son procédé de fabrication[2015/15]
Examination procedure06.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
11.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2019Fee for grant paid
08.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012181438  (WATANABE MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0042]; figures 1A-C,2A-C *;
 [Y]US2013048864  (NAKATSUGAWA HARUYASU [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0039] , [0041] - [0045] - [0046] , [0053] , [0104] - [0106] - [0107] , [0137]; figures 1,2,4,7-9,12 *;
 [YA]US2004124360  (LEVIN CRAIG S [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0030]; figures 2,3 * [A] 10;
 [Y]US2012126128  (WATANABE MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,5,11-13 * paragraphs [0026] , [0048] , [0064]; figures 2B,3B,7A-E *;
 [Y]US2006131503  (FREUND ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 4,9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US6393092  (YOSHIDA MINORU [JP]) [Y] 4,9 * column 8, lines 4-30 - column 9, lines 55-60; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO2010047494