blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2871094

EP2871094 - Headlamp assembly and headlamp of a motor vehicle and method for adjusting the headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH
Tübinger Strasse 123
72762 Reutlingen / DE
[2015/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Dreier, Bernd
Gustav-Werner-Straße 10
72116 Mössingen / DE
 [2019/28]
Former [2015/20]01 / Dreier, Bernd
Öschlestrasse 1
72116 Mössingen / DE
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/26]
Former [2015/20]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14187711.806.10.2014
[2015/20]
Priority number, dateDE20131022192629.10.2013         Original published format: DE102013221926
[2015/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2871094
Date:13.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2871094
Date:26.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:G01M11/06, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/076, B60Q1/10, B60Q1/12
[2019/03]
CPC:
G01M11/06 (EP); B60Q1/0023 (EP); B60Q1/076 (EP);
B60Q1/10 (EP); B60Q1/12 (EP); B60Q2200/38 (EP);
B60Q2300/132 (EP); B60Q2300/134 (EP); B60Q2300/322 (EP);
B60Q2300/324 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2015/20]B60Q1/10, B60Q1/115, B60Q1/12, G01M11/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Former [2015/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Scheinwerferanordnung und Scheinwerfer eines Kraftfahrzeugs und Verfahren zur Grundeinstellung des Scheinwerfers[2015/20]
English:Headlamp assembly and headlamp of a motor vehicle and method for adjusting the headlamp[2015/20]
French:Agencement de phare et phare pour un véhicule et procédé de réglage de base d'un phare[2015/20]
Examination procedure07.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
15.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2019Fee for grant paid
17.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.10.2014
AL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MK26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB06.10.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU06.10.2014
AL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB06.10.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2021/32]HU06.10.2014
AL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB06.10.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2021/26]AL26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB06.10.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/48]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
GB06.10.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/46]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE06.10.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/37]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU06.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
Former [2020/35]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU06.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/34]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
CH31.10.2019
LI31.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/29]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
DK26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
IT26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19720314  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-8,13-18 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 59; figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [XI]EP1316474  (DANA CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,13,15-18 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-7; claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 3,4,9-12,14,19,20;
 [A]WO2009053457  (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 1, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [XI]DE102008003707  (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,13,16,17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3; claims 1-11 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * [I] 3,4,7-12,14,15,18-20;
 [XI]DE102009047932  (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,13,16,17 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1,5; claims 1-7,10-13 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 3,4,7-12,14,15,18-20
by applicantDE202011003404U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.