Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2846527

EP2846527 - Method, apparatus and system for initiating calendar events [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2016/28]
Former [2015/11]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Teng, Mengshyang
2000 Bridge Drive
Extension 62027
Suite 100, 101
Redwood City, CA California / US
02 / Colbert, Michael S
561 Quail Lake Drive
Debary, FL Florida 32713 / US
03 / Zacuto, Jeffrey Scott
2000 Bridge Drive
Extension 62047
Suite 100, 101
Redwood City, CA California / US
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2016/28]
Former [2015/11]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date14189051.725.02.2008
[2015/11]
Priority number, dateUS20070891780P27.02.2007         Original published format: US 891780 P
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2846527
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2846527
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/56, G06Q10/00
[2015/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Vorrichtung und System zum Starten von Kalenderereignissen[2015/11]
English:Method, apparatus and system for initiating calendar events[2015/11]
French:Procédé, appareil et système pour initier des événements de calendrier[2015/11]
Examination procedure15.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
27.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2016Fee for grant paid
02.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08725990.9  / EP2137953
EP10167097.4  / EP2226996
Opposition(s)18.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.02.2008
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE25.02.2017
LU25.02.2017
MT25.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU25.02.2008
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE25.02.2017
LU25.02.2017
MT25.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE25.02.2017
LU25.02.2017
MT25.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE25.02.2017
LU25.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
LU25.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1047267  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0011] *;
 [A]EP1372328  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] - [0023] *;
 [A]US6760423  (TODD STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023] *
by applicantUS20070875212
 US20000593543