Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2866171

EP2866171 - Object detection method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Liu, Dianchao
c/o Ricoh Software Research Center Co., Ltd
Tengda Plaza 28th Floor
No. 168, Xiwai Street
100044 Haidian District / CN
02 / Lu, Yaojie
c/o Ricoh Software Research Center Co., Ltd
Tengda Plaza 28th Floor
No. 168, Xiwai Street
100044 Haidian District / CN
03 / Liu, Yuan
c/o Ricoh Software Research Center Co., Ltd
Tengda Plaza 28th Floor
No. 168, Xiwai Street
100044 Haidian District / CN
04 / Shi, Zhongchao
c/o Ricoh Software Research Center Co., Ltd
Tengda Plaza 28th Floor
No. 168, Xiwai Street
100044 Haidian District / CN
05 / Hu, Ping
c/o Ricoh Software Research Center Co., Ltd
Tengda Plaza 28th Floor
No. 168, Xiwai Street
100044 Haidian District / CN
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)White, Duncan Rohan , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House (2nd Floor)
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Maury, Richard Philip
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14189700.921.10.2014
[2015/18]
Priority number, dateCN20131050859424.10.2013         Original published format: CN201310508594
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2866171
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2866171
Date:20.05.2015
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/46, G06K9/62
[2015/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Objekterfassungsverfahren und -vorrichtung[2015/18]
English:Object detection method and device[2015/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détection d'objet[2015/18]
Examination procedure21.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
22.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2017Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
12.06.2017Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
21.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YD]  - D H BALLARD ET AL, "Generalizing the Hough transform to detect arbitrary shapes", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (19810101), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0031-3203(81)90009-1, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 111 - 122, XP055089257 [YD] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(81)90009-1
 [Y]  - SHENG-CHING JENG ET AL, "SCALE- AND ORIENTATION-INVARIANT GENERALIZED HOUGH TRANSFORM-A NEW APPROACH", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (19910101), vol. 24, no. 11, doi:10.1016/0031-3203(91)90120-T, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1037 - 1051, XP000243526 [Y] 1-10 * 3.1 Proposed scale-invariant cell value incrementation strategy for detecting a scaled shape *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(91)90120-T
 [YA]  - LARRY S. DAVIS, "Hierarchical generalized Hough transforms and line-segment based generalized Hough transforms", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (19820101), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0031-3203(82)90030-9, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 277 - 285, XP055179149 [Y] 7 * 3. Generalized Hough Transforms for Line Segment Patterns * [A] 1-6,8-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(82)90030-9
 [A]  - BALLARD D H ET AL, Computer Vision, COMPUTER VISION, PRENTICE HALL, PAGE(S) 123 - 131, (19820101), XP002485299 [A] 1-10 * 4.3.4 Generalizing the Hough Transform; page 128 - page 131 *
 [A]  - A.A KASSIM ET AL, "A comparative study of efficient generalised Hough transform techniques", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, (19990801), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0262-8856(98)00156-5, ISSN 0262-8856, pages 737 - 748, XP055180035 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-8856(98)00156-5
 [AD]  - QIN KARHUAI ET AL, "A Unified Approach Based on Hough Transform for Quick Detection of Circles and Rectangles", JOURNAL OF IMAGE AND GRAPHICS, CN, (20100101), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1006-8961, pages 109 - 115, XP055179269 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicant   - D. H. BALLARD, "Generalizing the Hough Transform to Detect Arbitrary Shapes", UNIVERSITY OF ROCHESTER, PATTERNS RECOGNITION, (1981), vol. 13.2, doi:doi:10.1016/0031-3203(81)90009-1, pages 111 - 122, XP002195911

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(81)90009-1
    - QIN KAIHUAI; WANG HAIYING; ZHENG JITAO, "A Unified Approach Based on Hough Transform for Quick Detection of Circles and Rectangles", JOURNAL OF IMAGE AND GRAPHICS, (201001), vol. 15, no. 1, XP055179269