Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2883853

EP2883853 - Coarse ceramic fire resistant product and method for its manufacture and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Refratechnik Holding GmbH
Adalperostrasse 82
85737 Ismaning / DE
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Klischat, Hans-Jürgen, Dr.
Pastor-Sander-Bogen 51
37083 Göttingen / DE
02 / Vellmer, Carsten, Dr.
Böttingerstraße 2a
37073 Göttingen / DE
03 / Wirsing, Holger
Jheringstraße 38
37081 Göttingen / DE
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2015/25]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14189763.721.10.2014
[2015/25]
Priority number, dateDE2013102073210.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013020732
[2015/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2883853
Date:17.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/25]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2883853
Date:16.09.2015
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2883853
Date:15.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/043, C04B35/101, C04B35/12, C04B35/18, C04B35/20, C04B35/44, C04B35/48
[2016/45]
Former International [2015/25]C04B35/043
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
TitleGerman:Grobkeramisches feuerfestes Erzeugnis und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie seine Verwendung[2015/25]
English:Coarse ceramic fire resistant product and method for its manufacture and its use[2015/25]
French:Produit de céramique refractaire, son procédé de fabrication ainsi que son utilisation[2016/45]
Former [2015/25]Produit de céramique industrielle ininflammable et procédé de fabrication ainsi qu'utilisation
Examination procedure20.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
11.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2017Fee for grant paid
27.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16200700.9  / EP3159320
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.10.2014
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
MT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE21.10.2017
LU21.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/45]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
MT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE21.10.2017
LU21.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
MT15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU21.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU21.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU21.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1260289  (UNIV PATRAS [GR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0018] , [0019] * * claims 3,4,8 * * table 2 * * claims 1,3,4,8,9 * * paragraph [0024]; example 1 * * example 2; table 6 * * tables 4,7 *;
 [XY]GB1327749  (OESTERR AMERIKAN MAGNESIT) [X] 1-6,8-10,13,14,17,18 * page 4; example 1 * * example 3 * * page 8; table . * * claim 6 * [Y] 11,12,16;
 [X]JP2013001584  (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO) [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * example 2; table 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0028] , [0029] , [0047] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0060] *;
 [Y]DE2044885  (OESTERR AMERIKAN MAGNESIT) [Y] 11,12,16 * page 3; table . * * example 1 * * pages 10-11; example 4 *;
 [A]JPH1160340  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] * * example 1 *;
 [A]GB755514  (GEN REFRACTORIES LTD) [A] 1-19 * page 3, lines 18-31 * * page 4, lines 1-49 *
ExaminationDE2200002
 EP1852405
 WO2008025441
by applicantDE102006040269
    - Gerald Routschka/Hartmut Wuthnow, Praxishandbuch ''Feuerfeste Werkstoffe, VULKAN-VERLAG, pages 1 - 7
    - Praxishandbuch, pages 211 - 214
    - Praxishandbuch, page 307