EP2875976 - Device for thermal conditioning of an air flow, in particular for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellenfant, Aurélie Chateau Quéru Route de Saint Fraimbault 72210 Roeze-sur-Sarthe / FR | 02 /
Robillon, Lionel 15 rue Boqueteaux 72230 Mulsanne / FR | 03 /
Tourneux, Fabienne 11 rue du Villaret 72000 Le Mans / FR | 04 /
Azzouz, Kamel 84 rue de Reuilly 75012 Paris / FR | 05 /
Hoger, Patrick Bellevue 72430 Ferce-sur-Sarthe / FR | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14190116.5 | 23.10.2014 | [2015/22] | Priority number, date | FR20130061028 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361028 | [2015/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875976 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B60H1/00492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur thermischen Konditionierung eines Luftstroms, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug | [2015/22] | English: | Device for thermal conditioning of an air flow, in particular for a motor vehicle | [2015/22] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement thermique d'un flux d'air notamment pour véhicule automobile | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 21.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102012008211 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0033]; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [X]JP2010243065 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,2,6,8 * abstract *; | [X]DE10124757 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011133182 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2011239696 (TAKAGI MOTOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011112636 (TRIDELTA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |