Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3015926

EP3015926 - Timepiece crown stem with a coding pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2016/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Ferri, Yvan
Avenue de France 43
1004 Lausanne / CH
02 / Hoover, David
Chemin du Criblet 6
1315 La Sarraz / CH
03 / Schmutz, Damien
Rue du Collège 20
2520 La Neuveville / CH
 [2016/18]
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date14190710.528.10.2014
[2016/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3015926
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G04C3/00
[2016/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2016/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Uhrenkronenschaft mit einem Codierungsmuster[2016/18]
English:Timepiece crown stem with a coding pattern[2016/18]
French:Tige de couronne de pièce d'horlogerie avec un motif de codage[2016/18]
Examination procedure28.10.2014Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2016Examination requested  [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]GB2037027  (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [X] 1,2,8-12,15 * abstract * * page 3, lines 5-127 * * figures 1-3,6 * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,13,14;
 [Y]US6422740  (LEUENBERGER CLAUDE-ERIC [CH]) [Y] 7 * column 1, lines 5-12 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 40 * * column 5, lines 47-58 * * figures 1-7 *