blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2871599

EP2871599 - Report data management server and report data management program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPS Co., Ltd.
16th Fl., Tower B
Grand Front Osaka
3-1, Ofuka-cho
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0011 / JP
[2015/20]
Inventor(s)01 / AKITA, Toshifumi
c/o IPS CO., LTD.
16th Fl., Tower B, Grand Front Osaka
3-1, Ofuka-cho, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP
 [2015/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[2015/20]
Application number, filing date14191037.230.10.2014
[2015/20]
Priority number, dateJP2013023051206.11.2013         Original published format: JP 2013230512
[2015/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2871599
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationIPC:G06Q10/06, G06Q40/00
[2015/20]
CPC:
G06Q10/10 (EP,US); G06Q10/06315 (CN); G06F16/254 (US);
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US); G06Q40/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Berichtsdatenverwaltungsserver und Berichtsdatenverwaltungsprogramm[2015/20]
English:Report data management server and report data management program[2015/20]
French:Serveur de gestion de données de rapport et programme de gestion de données de rapport[2015/20]
Examination procedure30.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/20]
14.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/21]
22.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/21]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006099964  (BARRESE JAMES J [US], et al) [I] 1-9* paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1, 6-8 *
by applicantJP2002312208
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.