blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2884542

EP2884542 - Integrated circuit device with power gating switch in back end of line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.09.2016  [2016/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Raghavan, Praveen
IMEC VZW, Patent department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
02 / Genoe, Jan
IMEC VZW, Patent departement
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
03 / Steudel, Soeren
IMEC VZW, Patent department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Patent Department IMEC
IMEC vzw
Patent Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Application number, filing date14191497.803.11.2014
[2015/25]
Priority number, dateEP2013019641310.12.2013         Original published format: EP 13196413
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2884542
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2884542
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:H01L29/786, H03K19/00, H01L23/00, H01L21/768, H01L23/525, H01L23/528, H01L23/532, H01L29/66, H01L27/12, H03K17/687
[2015/36]
CPC:
H03K17/687 (EP,US); H01L29/02 (KR); H01L29/7869 (US);
H01L23/525 (EP,US); H01L27/1218 (EP,US); H01L27/1225 (EP,US);
H01L27/124 (EP,US); H01L29/78 (KR); H01L23/5286 (EP,US);
H01L23/53238 (EP,US); H01L23/53295 (EP,US); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2015/25]H01L29/786, H03K19/00, H01L23/00, H01L21/768
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Integrierte Schaltungsvorrichtung mit Stromtakt-Netzschalter im Back-End einer Leitung[2015/25]
English:Integrated circuit device with power gating switch in back end of line[2015/25]
French:Dispositif de circuit intégré avec un commutateur à déclenchement de puissance à l'extrémité arrière de ligne[2015/25]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/25]
03.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/37]
11.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/37]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2003338559  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *;
 [X]US2004262635  (LEE SANG-YUN [US]) [X] 1,6-8,10 * abstract *;
 [X]US2013037795  (SUNAMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013069052  (SANDHU GURTEJ S [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]US2013153888  (INOUE NAOYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.