Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2998731

EP2998731 - Apparatus and method for measuring concentration of an analyte in whole blood samples [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CONCENTRATION OF AN ANALYTE IN WHOLE BLOOD SAMPLES
[2018/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
i-Sens, Inc.
Wolgye-dong
27-34 Gwangun-ro
Nowon-gu
Seoul 139-845 / KR
[2016/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Cha, Geun Sig
9 Hongeunjungang-ro 3an-gil
Seodaemun-gu
120-841 Seoul / KR
02 / Nam, Hakhyun
101-206, 69 Hancheon-ro 109-gil
Gangbuk-gu
142-742 Seoul / KR
03 / Lee, Seok-Won
613-3203, 248 Jeongjail-ro
Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si
463-863 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Choi, Sung Hyuk
10/3, 42-7 Hyangchon 6-gil
Gwacheon-si
427-802 Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Kang, Youngjea
104-2201, 61 Sungin-ro 2-gil
Seongbuk-gu
136-110 Seoul / KR
06 / Lee, Myeongho
68-9 Sungmun-gil
Mapo-gu
121-872 Seoul / KR
07 / Park, Ho Dong
108-1304, 1600 Bugwon-ro
Heungeop-myeon, Wonju-si
220-980 Gangwon-do / KR
08 / Cho, Sung Pil
107-1504, 1600 Bugwon-ro
Heungeop-myeon, Wonju-si
220-980 Gangwon-do / KR
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/12]
Application number, filing date14192132.006.11.2014
[2016/12]
Priority number, dateKR2014012381617.09.2014         Original published format: KR 20140123816
[2016/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2998731
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2998731
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/327, G01N33/49, G01N33/487
[2016/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2016/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA23.09.2016
ME23.09.2016
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Messung der Konzentration eines Analyten in Vollblutproben[2018/22]
English:Apparatus and method for measuring concentration of an analyte in whole blood samples[2018/22]
French:Appareil et procédé de mesure de concentration d'un analyte dans les échantillons de sang entier[2018/22]
Former [2016/12]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER KONZENTRATION EINES ANALYTEN IN VOLLBLUTPROBEN
Former [2016/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CONCENTRATION OF AN ANALYTE IN WHOLE BLOOD SAMPLES
Former [2016/12]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE CONCENTRATION D'UN ANALYTE DANS LES ÉCHANTILLONS DE SANG ENTIER
Examination procedure06.11.2014Examination requested  [2016/12]
28.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
21.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2018Fee for grant paid
27.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)27.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
21.12.2016Request for further processing filed
21.12.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.01.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
DK26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/48]
Former [2019/46]AL26.12.2018
AT26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SK26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
IS26.04.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
EE26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RO26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
SM26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL26.12.2018
CZ26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
PL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011155588  (LICA GEORGETA [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,11,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure - * [I] 3,4,7-10,13,14,16;
 [AD]KR20130131117  (I SENS INC [KR]) [AD] 1-16 * figure 6c *;
 [A]US2014135605  (GOTTLIEB REBECCA K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0015] , [0113] , [0114]; figure - *;
 [A]WO9502357  (CYGNUS THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007079015  (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0066] *
by applicantUS5708247
 US5951836
 US5628890
 US7641785
 US7390667
 US2004079652
 US2005164328
 US2011139634
 US2012111739
 US7597793
 US6475372
 US8460537
 US2009026094
 EP2746759
 WO2013164632
 KR20130131117
 US8287717