blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2873940 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2873940



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.08.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
08.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
08.08.2018 Description Search / examination 7
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.01.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
02.11.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.05.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
13.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
04.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Priority document Search / examination 29
12.11.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
12.11.2014 Description Search / examination 28
12.11.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
12.11.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5