blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2882087

EP2882087 - DC-DC converter with operation in discontinuous mode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU, MK
published on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EM Microelectronic-Marin SA
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2015/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Saby, Jérôme
Rue du Bassin 10a
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
02 / Theoduloz, Yves
Av. Haldimand 35
1400 Yverdon / CH
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Giraud, Eric, et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2018/38]
Former [2015/24]Giraud, Eric, et al
ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date14192939.813.11.2014
[2015/24]
Priority number, dateEP2013019540503.12.2013         Original published format: EP 13195405
[2015/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2882087
Date:10.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2882087
Date:19.09.2018
Language:FR
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:H02M3/158, // H02M1/00
[2015/24]
CPC:
H02M3/1588 (EP,US); H02M3/158 (US); H02M1/0009 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2015/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gleichstrom-Gleichstrom-Wandler in diskontinuierlichem Betriebsmodus[2015/24]
English:DC-DC converter with operation in discontinuous mode[2015/24]
French:Convertisseur DC-DC à fonctionnement en mode discontinu[2015/24]
Examination procedure26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.06.2018Fee for grant paid
19.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
13.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.11.2014
AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CY19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
MK19.09.2018
MT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
TR19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
GB19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2020/31]
Former [2020/17]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
MT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
TR19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
GB19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2020/08]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
MT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
GB19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2020/03]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
GB19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/50]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/48]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE13.11.2018
LU13.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU13.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US6151233  (KONDO KATSUYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-16 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 19 * * column 6, line 21 - line 29 * * column 11, line 59 - column 13, line 15 * * column 14, line 33 - column 26, line 26 * * figures 10,12,18 *;
 [I]EP1632827  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0047] ** figure 1 *;
 [I]US2009243577  (LIM TEIK KAI [SG]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 6A,6B,9B,10A,10B,13B *
by applicantEP2104213
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.